Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Filer, Nicholas R, against Salazar, Matthew W, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Michelle L. Ressa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order 9: ORDER RE: JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; COMMISS STEVEN N. GROVDAHL #69; |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion 8: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 6: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 7: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 129096741; |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 5: DEFAULT JUDGMENT 129096741; COMMISSIONER MICHELLE RESSA; |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 4: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; DEFAULT JDGMT; |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 3: DECLARATION OF SERVICE 11-3-12; |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 1: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.