Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Laplante, Pamela D, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Deissner, Dustin Douglass, against Divco Inc, Stentz, Tim R Etux, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Jerome J. Leveque presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment 18: JUDGMENT; 129065977; JUDGE JEROME J. LEVEQUE; |
|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation 17: NOTICE OF PRESENTATION 09-07-2012; |
|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 16: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 09-07-2012 @ 11 AM; |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 14: PROPOSED ORDER/FINDINGS; |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 15: DECLARATION SVR 08-30-2012; |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation 13: NOTICE OF PRESENTATION 9-7-12; |
|
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate 12: CERTIFICATE SVR 08-02-2012 AMENDED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.