Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Osterman, Peter Russell, against Ficklin, Lance, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 48: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 129000107; 139028018 139067196 149016719; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment 47: JUDGMENT; 149016719; COMMISS STEVEN N. GROVDAHL #69; |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Release 46: RELEASE PART GARNISHMENT 139067196; |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 44: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 45: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 43: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 42: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AMEND; |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 41: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; 139089998; |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 40: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.