Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eschette, Kathryn, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against Egland, Christine, represented by Cossey, Robert R, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Linda G. Tompkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 9: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE LINDA G TOMPKINS ID#68; |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
PreTrial Management Hearing -: PRE-TRIAL MANAGEMENT HEARING; JUDGE LINDA G TOMPKINS ID#68; |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney 8: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY; |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule 7: ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE; 04-08-2013TS; JUDGE LINDA G TOMPKINS ID#68; |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance 6: ORDER OF CONTINUANCE; JUDGE LINDA G TOMPKINS ID#68; |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference / Hearing -: STATUS CONFERENCE / HEARING; JUDGE LINDA G TOMPKINS ID#68; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.