Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Numerica Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Phillabaum, Sheryl S., against Giampietri, Joseph M Etux, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Julia M. Pelc presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 47: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; 119094545; |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 46: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 45: DECLARATION OF MAILING 01-14-2014; |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 44: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 119094545; |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 43: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 42: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 139063590; |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary 41: JUDGMENT SUMMARY 139063590; 119094545; COMMISS STEVEN N. GROVDAHL #69; |
|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion 40: MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 39: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.