Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fisher, Christina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Highberg, Erik Eugene, against Keck, Jeffrey L Etux, represented by Cronin, Steven M., in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Tari S. Eitzen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2011 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 14: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; STIPULATED; JUDGE TARI S. EITZEN; |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury 12 Person 13: DEMAND FOR JURY-12 PERSON; |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendants List of Witnesses 12: DEFENDANT'S LIST OF WITNESSES; |
|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Witness List 11: WITNESS LIST; PLAINTIFF: FISHER, CHRISTINA; |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposition 10: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION MOCABEE, MAPT; RICHARD D; |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposition 9: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION SCHMITZ, M A; |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposition 8: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION FISHER, C; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.