Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Powell, Gregory S Etux, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Michelle L. Ressa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 74: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 169046681; 159028791 119099938; |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment 73: JUDGMENT AND ORDER TO PAY; 11909993-8 16904668-1; PRO TEM COM NIKKI SWENNUMSON; |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy 69: COPY 2ND ANSWER TO WRIT GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 72: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 71: DECLARATION SUPPORT GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion 70: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT; |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 68: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary 67: JUDGMENT SUMMARY 159028791; 119099938; COMMISSIONER RACHELLE E ANDERSON; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 65: DECLARATION GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.