Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Smith, Eugene R, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 7: ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; COMMISS STEVEN N. GROVDAHL #69; |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 6: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 5: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; 119097838; COMMISS STEVEN N. GROVDAHL #69; |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 3: DECLARATION OF SERVICE 10-11-11; |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 4: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; DEFAULT JDGMT; |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service 2: NT RE: DEPENDENT OF MILITARY PERSON; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: HAMMER, ISAAC L; |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 1: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.