Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Farm Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Osterman, Peter Russell, against Holznagel, Clinton Etux, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Michelle L. Ressa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 27: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment Lien 28: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN; 129096937; |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy 26: NOTICE OF STAY RE: BANKRUPTCY; 119097846; |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 25: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 11909784-6; |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 24: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary 23: JUDGMENT SUMMARY; 129096937 119097846; COMMISSIONER RACHELLE E ANDERSON; |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 21: DECLARATION OF MAILING 08-28-2012; |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 22: DECLARATION OF MAILING 5-4-12; |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 20: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.