Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Smith, Donna J, against Rathbone, Curtis L, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 9: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 8: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 119093891; |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 7: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 6: DEFAULT JUDGMENT 119093891; COMMISS STEVEN N. GROVDAHL #69; |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 5: MOTION FOR DEFAULT, DECLARATION &; DEFAULT JDGMT; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill 4: COST BILL; NOT SIGNED; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 3: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; NOT SIGNED; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 2: DECLARATION OF SERVICE 10-8-11; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.