Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Scruggs, Rhonda W H, Scruggs, Verne H W, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Arriaga, Jose Etux, Sauceda, Leonel Etux, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Gregory D. Sypolt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2011 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | TS Trial Setting | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter 38: LETTER RE: 03-01-2013 PRETRIAL CONF; |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 37: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGE GREGORY D. SYPOLT; |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Unknown Party -: HEARING CANCELLED: UNKNOWN PARTY; JUDGE GREGORY D. SYPOLT; |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 35: DECLARATION OF MAILING 12-6-12; |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendants List of Witnesses 36: DEFENDANT'S LIST OF WITNESSES; |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue 34: MOTION TO CONTINUE; |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 33: DECLARATION OF AXTELL, BRAD; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.