Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Layman, Patrick James, against Karber, Lucinda Etvir, Nearing, Steven M Etux Etal, in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts with Ellen Kalama Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllen Kalama Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Return On 10: RETURN ON ORDER OF REPLEVIN; |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 9: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; 01-12-06; |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE ELLEN KALAMA CLARK ID#70; |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | TF Short Hearings | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order 7: ORDER SEIZURE OF VEHICLE; JUDGE ELLEN KALAMA CLARK ID#70; |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order 8: ORDER WAIVE REPLEVIN BOND; JUDGE ELLEN KALAMA CLARK ID#70; |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel 6: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 5: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 01-20-2006TF; COMMISSIONER JOSEPH F. VALENTE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.