Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Budell, John A filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Spokane County, WA, . Spokane County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSpokane County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Destruction -: ORDER OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 13: RETURN OF SERVICE; JOHN A BUDELL 3-21-2007; |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event | D3 1:30 pm | |
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Resolution Hearing -: UNCONTESTED RESOLUTION HEARING; COMMISSIONER JOSEPH F. VALENTE; |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 12: ORD FOR PROTECTION; COMMISSIONER JOSEPH F. VALENTE; |
|
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 11: RETURN OF SERVICE 05-25-06; |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Confidential Report in Sealed Envelope 9: CONFIDNTL REPORT IN SEALED ENVELOPE; CONF INFOR FORM; |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order for Protection 10: TEMP ORD FOR PROTECTION; 06-08-2006D3; COMMISSIONER FRED W. ARONOW; |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition for Order for Protection 7: PET ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Application 8: APPLICATION FOR PROTECTION; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.