Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Evans, Nicole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sullivan, Brian Michael, against Hoglund, Scott, Reece Construction Co, represented by Gillaspy, Betsy A., in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Cont by Stip from 5/1. Set 5 days, 6 person; Judge: Appel, George F |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Cont by Stip from 5/1. Set 5 days, 6 person |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Cancelled Unknown Party | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 6 person, set 5 days Judge: Larsen, Cindy |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial Date - Amended Judge: Appel, George F |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.