Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ascentium Capital, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kelly, Benjamin E, against D Y Kim Inc, Kim, Mee, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Patrick M. Moriarty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick M. Moriarty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant HERITAGE BANK $ 13,073.36; GARN COSTS $0.00 Judge: Moriarty, Patrick M |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of NonMilitary Service | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.