Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hovander, Cheri L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Freise, Eric Louis, against Navarro Arevalo, Edwin A, Puget Sound Investment Capital Inc, represented by Reppart, Kimberly Anne, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with George F. Appel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Cancelled Unknown Party | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Set 5 days, 12 person Judge: Appel, George F |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Johnson, Ian |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Admission of Responsibility |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Thomas Heinrich |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply surreply regarding trial setting |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply re Trial Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.