Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wild Horse At Woods Creek Owners Assoc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mcmahon-Myhran, Lisa M, against Nixon, Rachel, Nixon, Tyler, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy G. Waggoner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant
Judge: Waggoner, Tracy G |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure
Judge: Waggoner, Tracy G |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service *Amended |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.