Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cemex Construction Materials Pacific, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Carpenter, Glenn Paul, against First National Insurance Co Of America, G G Excavation Inc, Gilden, Diana M, Gilden, Gene E H H, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 28: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 27: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; COMMISSIONER JACALYN D. BRUDVIK; |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 26: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 25: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 24: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ 23: ANSWER TO WRIT; |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 22: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment -: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 21: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.