Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zylstra, Christine H W, Zylstra, Fred, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case against Planning & Development Services Department, Snohomish, County Of, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Richard T. Okrent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard T. Okrent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2011 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | JC Judge's Personal Weekly Calendar | |
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; *********************************; |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 14: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE RICHARD T. OKRENT; |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel 13: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; FOR BOTH PLTFS; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: HEMBREE, DANIEL LEE; W/D ATTY FOR PLA./PET.: GOURLEY, BRYAN CRAIG; |
|
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 12: ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE; 10-12-2012JC; @ 1PM BEFORE JUDGE OKRENT; JUDGE RICHARD T. OKRENT; |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 11: ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE -; AMENDED; JUDGE RICHARD T. OKRENT; |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Transcript 10: ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL RECORD; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.