Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Patenaude, Raymond Alcide, against Devalsantos, Wilma, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2010 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time217 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; American Express Centurion Bank vs. Davalsantos, W. et al. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Dec 27 2010 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet 212350-Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET [212350] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.