Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nelson, Holly, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Ferguson, Gregory D., against Scheratski, Marfa, Cam, Pirfil, Carson Hot Springs Resort, Llc, Bonneville Hot Springs, Inc., represented by Peters, Sharon, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated - with Prejudice Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint for Sex Discrimination (Sexual Harassment) |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.