Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Birkenfeld Heritage, Llc, Weyerhaeuser Columbia Timberlands Llc, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Christie, Bradley S, Paris, Becky J, Pinson, James P, represented by Leatham, Stephen Garrett, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2017 |
CategoryCon Condemnation |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and or Unopen | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Payment of Just Compensation, Costs, and Attorneys Fees |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Regarding Defendants' Petition for Legal Fees and Costs Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-6 Assessment of Damages Re: Condemnation of Private Way Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.