Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mclellan, Aaron, against Bollinger, Ann M, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Release 9: FULL RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 8: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 6: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 7: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment 5: STIPULATED JUDGMENT; |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Summary Judgment | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.