Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Progressive Universal Insurance, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Juhl, Nicholas William, against Doe, John Jane, Niedert, Alice M., in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2014 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 11: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 10: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 9: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Court Record to DOL 8: ABSTRACT OF COURT RECORD TO DOL; |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 7: ORDER OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT; |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 6: DCLR OF ELIZABETH MUNDING SUPP MT; |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration of Sum Certain 5: DECLARATION SUM CERTAIN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.