Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hatfield, Janet Pr For Estate William Hatfield, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Meyer, David Wayne, against Camp Melacoma Association, Snoey, Malgorzata, Snoey, Peter A., represented by Andersen, Bradley W., in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2014 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit - Destruction of Exhibits |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and or Unopen | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment 66: FINAL JUDGMENT; |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance -: HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
S3 Standby Motion Calendar 1:30PM - NT OF PRSNT OF FINAL JDGMT |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation 65: NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORDER; |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation 64: CITATION; 02-16-2017S3; 1:30PM - NT OF PRSNT OF FINAL JDGMT; |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 63: PLANTIFF NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.