Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fischer, Jamael, Fischer, Phillip, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Bye, Laura, Bye, Steiner, Carleton Heights Homeowners Asso, Snyder, Donna, Snyder, Leo, (total of 5) See All represented by Hazen, Laura Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2011 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 15: CLERK'S ORD OF DISM WNT PROSECUTION; |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 14: CLK MT DISM FR WNT PROS/DCLR MAIL; |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance -: HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
S2 Standby Motion Calendar 1:30- MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation 13: CITATION; 01-03-2013S2; 1:30- MOTION TO COMPEL; |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel 11: MOTION TO COMPEL DEF TO ANSWER; |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 12: DCLR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL; |
|
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested -: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.