Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sherwin-Williams Company, The, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siderius, Frank Raymond, against Infinity Painting And Home Care Llc.,, Lexton Insurance Company, Lopez, Jesus Rigoberto, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Heather D. Shand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHeather D. Shand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2022 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY Judge: Shand, Heather |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANT LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment (PARTIAL) |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment AS TO DEFENDANT CONTRACTOR ONLY Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF PAMELA S. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF SUM CERTAIN DUE |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment & DECLARATION AS TO DEFENDANT CONTRACTOR ONLY |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.