Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The City Of Mount Vernon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sjostrom, Craig David, against Hp Mobile Wash Inc, Unibank, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Thomas L. Verge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas L. Verge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release LIS PENDENTS |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.