Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
May, Loren, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by O'Laughlin, Matthew James, against Johnston, Allison, Sedro Woolley School District, represented by Leonard, Curtis Michael, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Heather D. Shand presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 4 days; 1st set |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated AGREED Judge: Crandall, Mary K |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice STIPULATED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 1st set; 4 days |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date 12-PERSON JURY TRIAL -10/11/22 @ 9 AM - 4 DAYS - 1ST SET |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter or Notice of Schedule Conflict | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial Docket 12-JURY 3-4 DAYS WLAD AGE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter or Notice of Schedule Conflict |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.