Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hammingh, Dennis L, Hammingh, Rose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lester, Thomas Eugene, against Bernal-Claudio, Jesus, Skagit River Farmlands Llc, Skagit River Ranch Llc, Skagit Valley Farms, Vojkovich, George, (total of 6) See All represented by Floerchinger, Dean, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth Y. Neidzwski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Y. Neidzwski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 4 days Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address WILLIAM (BILL) D. ROBISON |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order AMENDED DISCOVERY Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Witness List PLAINTIFF - SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date 12-JURY 10/24/23-10/27/23 @ 9AM 4-DAYS 1ST SET |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter or Notice of Schedule Conflict DEFENDANTS |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter or Notice of Schedule Conflict ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule TRIAL ASSIGNMENT: 1/23/23 @ 9:30 Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.