Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fiedler, Lynn, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gooding, James F., against Washington State Department Of Transportation, Washington State Ferries, Washington State Parks And Recreation Commission, represented by O'Brien, Meghan Callagee, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth Y. Neidzwski presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed GLP Attorneys, PS |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Disburse Funds | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF THE COURT |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial-12 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment STIPULATED Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule AGREED ON DISCOVERY Judge: Shand, Heather |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.