Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ressler, Kyle R. filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Delivery |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Protection From Civil Harassment | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Bernard Ressler |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Response | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter re ex parte communication |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter re Kyle attending an art class |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.