Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fedarko, Jeremy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grube, Joseph Andrew, against Lewis, Dwight, represented by Wiegenstein, John Henry, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date AMENDED |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Readiness Hearing | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Joint Motion and Stipulated Order for Trial Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.