Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tal Holdings, Llc Dba Browne'S Home Center, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Wertjes, Alan J, against Andrew Johnson Dba Big Johnson Construction, Hartford Insurance Co The Midwest, Navigators Ins Co, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Withdrawl |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Navigators Insurance |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons 2nd Amended |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest ONLY |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order of Voluntary Dismissal Against Hartford Insurance Co Midwest Only |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action Without Order
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration for Order Authorizing Service of Process by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.