Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gilliland, Judith, Gilliland, Paul, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quinn, Sallye N, against Eco Cleaners, Inc., Eco Cleaners,. Inc., Wagner, Daniela, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk to Release Cash Bond | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF THE COURT TO RELEASE CASH BOND |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter re: Requesting Bond Posted |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Release of Writ of Garnishment |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Summary Judgment | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Supplemental Declaration - Sallye Quinn |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment Markpeak - Daniela Wagner |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment Markpeak - Eco Cleaners |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.