Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Friday Harbor Associates, Lp, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Brain, Christopher Ian, against Orca Dreams, Llc, represented by O'Day, Stephanie Johnson, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Judge, Odyssey |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY, TO COMPEL, AND TO MOVE THE TRIAL DATE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes for Hearing in Island County |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.