Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dima, Heather, Dennee, Amanda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Petrie, Denise, Mason, David, Mason, Christopher P., Herb'S Tavern, Llc, represented by Wood, Lesli, Lee, Marvin Min-Sup, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order of Dismissal | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.