Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ellis Properties, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Sorensen, Rock C, against Pike, Connee, represented by Alexander, Shawn B, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2017 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Eaton, Donald E |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation
Judge: Eaton, Donald E |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer 6: ANSWER; |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service 4: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 5: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 3: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT; |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons 1: SUMMONS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.