Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mclellan, Aaron, against Smart, Jeri, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment US Bank |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant 14: JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE DEFENDNT; |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 11: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 13: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Certified Mail 12: RETURN RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL; |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - US BANK; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.