Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marok, Kanwaljit S., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Chastain, Seth Edward, against Green Building Innov Corp, Dahl, Christopher And Tmcct, Labor And Industries, Wa Dept Of, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2017 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 84: ORDER OF DISMISSAL -STIPULATED; |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 83: PROPOSED ORDER/FINDINGS; |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 59: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 02-27-2017; 9:00 10-DAY JURY TRIAL; |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 81: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 82: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 80: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Smith, Kevin Ford; |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; ACTUAL PROCEEDING TIME; |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 79: COURT HEARING MINUTES; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.