Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aldort, Harvey, Aldort, Naomi, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Thomas, Tim, Thomas, Marie, The Thomas Living Trust, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 7: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens 6: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 5: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy 4: NOTICE OF STAY RE: BANKRUPTCY; (DEFENDANTS); |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stay -: STAY; |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 3: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE TO REAL; PROPERTY; |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.