Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Progressive Casualty Insurance, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kristof, James Michael, against Wayner, Zachary, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2014 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract of Court Record to DOL | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Court Record to DOL | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion and Declaration of James Kristof |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Permitting Payment of Judgment in Installments Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment for a Motor Vehicle Loss |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Re Defendants Default on Prior Installment Order Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter from Atty to Clerk |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter ltr from Atty to Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.