Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
San Juan County, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Vira, Amy, against Trustee Of Leslie E Speed Familytrust, Speed, Errol, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 32: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; 05-12-2017; CLERK'S CLOSURE; |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 37: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 36: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 35: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Report 34: REPORT -STATUS; |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 33: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 32: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; 05-12-2017; CLERK'S CLOSURE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.