Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dunlap, David D, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Delay, Lawrence Curt, against American Contractors Indemnity, Irvin, Timothy Joseph, represented by Friedrich, Alexander A., in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 46: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 45: FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Exhibits or Unopened Depositions 44: RECEIPT FOR EXHIBIT/UNOPENED DEPOS; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Delay, Lawrence Curt; |
|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 42: ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL EXAMINATION; 09-27-2013; SUPPLEMENTAL EXAMINATION; |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested -: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; VANESSA FOR P FRIEDRICH; |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 43: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order for Exam 42: ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL EXAMINATION; 09-27-2013; SUPPLEMENTAL EXAMINATION; |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 41: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR SUPPLEMENTAL EXAMINATION; |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter 40: LETTER TO CLERK FROM PAUL K; FRIEDRICH DATED 7/25/2013; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.