Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Osterman, Peter Russell, against Garriga, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 9: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
MS Miscellaneous Settings CLERK'S CLOSURE |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 7: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; 05-10-2013MS; CLERK'S CLOSURE; |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 8: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 6: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 5: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 4: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR MONIES DUE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.