Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
San Juan County, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Vira, Amy, against Durland, Michael S, represented by Delay, Lawrence Curt, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy 44: COPY DOCKET; |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Exhibits or Unopened Depositions 43: RECEIPT FOR EXHIBIT/UNOPENED DEPOS; |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and or Unopen 42: STIP&OR RET EXHBTS UNOPNED DEPOSTNS; |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Exhibits or Unopened Depositions -: CLERK RETURNED; |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 41: ORDER OF DISMISSAL -STIPULATED; |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 39: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 12-09-2011; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-1:30; |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested -: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
November 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
SS Special Settings - 1:30 pm MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.