Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jameson, Henry, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sorensen, Rock C, against Safeguard Properties, Llc, represented by Dinsdale, Christine Elisabeth, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2013 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy 11: COPY DOCKET; |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 10: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 9: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Sorensen, Rock C; |
|
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice 8: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer 7: DEFT SAFEGUARD PROPERTIES, LLC; ANSWER TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT; |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 6: DEFT SAFEGUARD PROPERTIES LLC'S; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-ORIGINAL; |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 5: DEFT SAFEGUARD PROPETIES, LLC; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-DINSDALE; |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.