Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Querry, Robert Et Vir, Tamai, Terra Lue, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Thomas, Hyon Su, China Pearl Of Friday Harbor, Inc, represented by Gross, David, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2011 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy 16: COPY CASE; |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 15: ORDER OF DISMISSAL -STIPULATED; WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 14: STIPULATION TO ALLOW ELECTRONIC; AND/OR FACSIMILE SERVICE; |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 13: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer 12: DEFTS ANSWER TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT; FOR DAMAGES; |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 11: ORDER ADMITTING KENNETH SATIN; AS CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS; |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; ACTUAL PROCEEDING TIME; |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
CP Supplemental Proceedings MOTION FOR LIMITED ADMISSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.