Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, Issuer Of The Discover Card, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by White, Krista L, against Rist, Harold F, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy 15: COPY DOCKET; |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order 14: ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 13: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 12: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM; AND ADDRESS; |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 11: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; KRISTA WHITE FOR BISHOP WHITE; |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 9: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 10: ORDER OF DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.