Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Port Of Orcas, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Aerohope Llc, Apogee Flight Inc, Bach, Richard, Bach, Sabryna, Bastron, Jo Anne, (total of 78) See All represented by Johnson, Dale Noel, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2011 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy 224: COPY CASE; |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Destroyed 223: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DESTRUCTION; |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment 222: DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 221: FINDINGS OF FACT&CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 220: COURT HEARING MINUTES 12/30/13; |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
MS Miscellaneous Settings 11AM SPECIAL SET PRESENTATION OF FINDINGS/JUDGMENT1 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; ACTUAL PROCEEDING TIME; |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate 218: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 215: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 12-30-2013MS; 11AM SPECIAL SET; PRESENTATION OF FINDINGS/JUDGMENT1; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.